Karpinski, Jolanta Anna Maria (CPSO#: 62470)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Apr 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital - Riverside Site
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone: (613) 738-8400 Ext. 82538
Fax: (613) 738-8337
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Karpinski Klaassen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 28 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Klaassen ( CPSO# 62471 )
Dr. J. Karpinski ( CPSO# 62470 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital- Riverside Site
5th Floor, 1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone Number: (613) 738-8400

Business Address:
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600


Corporation Name: R. J. Klaassen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 26 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Klaassen ( CPSO# 62471 )
Dr. J. Karpinski ( CPSO# 62470 )

Business Address:
401 Smyth Road
Suite 2638-1
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bruyere Continuing Care-St Vincent Hospital Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 08 Sep 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOLANTA ANNA MARIA KARPINSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KARPINSKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Apr 1993