Kashanian, Behnam (CPSO#: 82136)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jan 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jan 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:University of Tehran, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Humber River Regional Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
1235 Wilson Ave.
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone: (416) 242-1000
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Promenade Endoscopy
1315 Finch Ave west, 3rd floor
North York ON  M3J 2G6
Canada
Phone: (416) 634-0001
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Downsview Endoscopy Clinic
1635 Lawrence Ave West
unit 201
Toronto ON  M6L 3C9
Canada
Phone: (416) 630-7388
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

North Toronto Eye Surgery Centre
2 Champagne Drive, Unit C2
Toronto ON  M3J0K2
Canada
Phone: 416-792-3043
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

North Toronto Eye Surgery Centre
2 Champagne Drive, Unit C2
Toronto ON  M3J 0K2
Canada
Phone: 416-792-3043
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Branson Centre, NYGH
555 Finch Ave West
Toronto ON  M2R 1N5
Canada
Phone: (416) 633-9420
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

York Diagnostic Centre
3585 Keele St
North York ON  M3J 3H5
Canada
Phone: (416) 398-2288
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Can-Am HIFU
123 Edwards St
Toronto ON  M5G 1E2
Canada
Phone: (416) 924-9760
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Rough Valley Centenary
2867 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Canada
Phone: (416) 284-8131
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Holly Street Endoscopy Clinic
40 Holly Street, Suite 301
Toronto ON  M4S 3C3
Canada
Phone: (416) 486-8088
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Dr Martin Jugenburg Toronto Cosmeti
Level B Fairmont Royal York Hotel 1
100 Front St W
Toronto ON  M5J 1E3
Canada
Phone: (416) 834-6640
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hedi Hooshangi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 08 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Hooshangi ( CPSO# 83913 )
Dr. B. Kashanian ( CPSO# 82136 )

Business Address:
920 - 305 Milner Avenue
Markham ON  M1B 3V4
Phone Number: (905) 856-2626

Business Address:
Rouge Valley Health System
Centenary Site - Dept of Anaesthesia
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Phone Number: (416) 284-8131

Business Address:
302-1315 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M3J 2G6
Phone Number: (416) 634-0001

Business Address:
211-330 York Regional Road 7
Toronto ON  L4B 3P8
Phone Number: (905) 707-5007

Business Address:
201 - 1635 Lawrence Avenue West
Toronto ON  M6L 3C9
Phone Number: (416) 630-7388

Business Address:
301 - 40 Holly Street
Toronto ON  M4S 3C3

Business Address:
400 - 1366 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4T 3A7

Business Address:
1031 Brock Road
Pickering ON  L1W 3T7
Phone Number: (905) 683-1700

Business Address:
500 - 1940 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto ON  M1L 4R1

Business Address:
3585 Keele Street
North York ON  M3J 3H5
Phone Number: (416) 398-2288


Corporation Name: Behnam Kashanian Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 21 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Hooshangi ( CPSO# 83913 )
Dr. B. Kashanian ( CPSO# 82136 )

Business Address:
3585 Keele Street
North York ON  M3J 3H5

Business Address:
302-1315 Finch Avenue West
North York ON  M3J 2G6
Phone Number: (416) 634-0001

Business Address:
555 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M2R 2C2
Phone Number: (416) 633-9420

Business Address:
305 Milner Avenue
Suite 920
Toronto ON  M1B 3V4
Phone Number: (905) 856-2626

Business Address:
201 - 1635 Lawrence Avenue West
Toronto ON  M6L 3C9
Phone Number: (416) 630-7388

Business Address:
211 - 300 York Mills Road
Toronto ON  M1N 4E4
Phone Number: (416) 391-4452

Business Address:
301 - 2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Phone Number: (416) 284-8131

Business Address:
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 242-1000

Business Address:
301 - 40 Holly Street
Toronto ON  M4S 3C3
Phone Number: (416) 486-8088

Business Address:
400 - 1366 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4T 3A7
Phone Number: (416) 926-0262

Business Address:
211 - 330 York Regional Road 7
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3P8
Phone Number: (905) 707-5007

Business Address:
201 - 1031 Brock Road
Pickering ON  L1W 3T7
Phone Number: (905) 683-2577

Business Address:
500 - 1940 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1L 4R1
Phone Number: (416) 752-5222

Business Address:
101-133 Hazelton Avenue
Toronto ON  M5R 0A6
Phone Number: (416) 929-9800

Business Address:
A-890 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4W 3P4
Phone Number: (416) 962-4444

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 15 Nov 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BEHNAM KASHANIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KASHANIAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2005 to 31 Mar 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Anaesthesia

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Apr 2005 to 31 Dec 2005
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Anaesthesia

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Mar 2007
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
International Specialist Physician - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2008 to 29 Feb 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Mar 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Feb 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Apr 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Jan 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jan 2010