Kashfi, Arash (CPSO#: 90720)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Persian

Education:University of Tehran, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
c/o Dr. Lloyd Smith
4001 Leslie St.
Suite 1W-103
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6618
Fax: (416) 756-6621
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Arash Kashfi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 05 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kashfi ( CPSO# 90720 )

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Suite 1W-103
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6618

Business Address:
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 438-2911

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ARASH KASHFI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KASHFI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 19 Oct 2009
Assessment Verification Period - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 20 Oct 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 29 Feb 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2012 to 28 Feb 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 28 Feb 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016