Kashgari, Alia Yousif Ashour (CPSO#: 84142)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Aug 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC Victoria Hospital
Division of Respirology
Room E6-206
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8094
Fax: (519) 685-8406
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Karim Qumosani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 31 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Qumosani ( CPSO# 84148 )
Dr. A. Kashgari ( CPSO# 84142 )

Business Address:
University Hospital
Suite A L L 126
PO Box 5339
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 663-3976

Business Address:
LHSC Victoria Hospital
Division of Respirology
Room E6-206
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8094

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Aug 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 05 Oct 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALIA YOUSIF ASHOUR KASHGARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KASHGARI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Apr 2006 to 09 Jun 2006
PEAP - Resident - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 10 Jun 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 02 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 03 Sep 2008 to 31 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 2009 to 31 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respirology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respirology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Respirology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Respirology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 07 Apr 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2011