Kassam, Farrah (CPSO#: 79009)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Mar 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Stronach Regional Cancer Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521 Ext. 6596
Fax: (905) 952-2818
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Farrah Kassam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 28 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Kassam ( CPSO# 79009 )

Business Address:
Stronach Regional Cancer Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Nov 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 30 Nov 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FARRAH KASSAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KASSAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Nov 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Dec 2007 to 30 Nov 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Mar 2008