Kassam, Hanif (CPSO#: 65659)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi, Kachchi

Education:McMaster University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
7064 Airport Rd
Mississauga ON  L4T 2G8
Phone: (416) 487-3885
Fax: (905) 671-0022
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

30 Martha St
Unit 104
Bolton ON  L7E 5V1
Canada
Phone: (905) 230-8320
Fax: (905 248-1116
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

680 Rexdale Blvd
Unit 11
Etobicoke ON  M9W 0B5
Canada
Phone: (416) 487-3885
Fax: (905) 248-1116
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Community Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HANIF KASSAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KASSAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1993