Katarey, Neel Anand (CPSO#: 95307)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Sep 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Sep 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Manipal Academy of Higher Education, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1245 Lakeshore Road
Burlington ON  L7S 0A2
Phone: (647) 405-6100
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: N. A. Katarey Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 11 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Katarey ( CPSO# 95307 )

Business Address:
1245 Lakeshore Road
Burlington ON  L7S 0A2
Phone Number: (647) 405-6100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation,St. Peter's Hospital Hamilton
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Muskoka Algonquin Health Care,South Muskoka Memorial Site Bracebridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 02 May 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NEEL ANAND KATAREY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KATAREY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 25 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 26 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 12 Jan 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 13 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2014 to 11 Jan 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 12 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2015 to 17 Jan 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Jul 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jan 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2017