Kates, Warren Bradley (CPSO#: 62538)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Aug 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1235 Trafalgar Road
Suite 304
Oakville ON  L6H 3P1
Phone: (905) 842-3555
Fax: (905) 849-6990
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

61 Queen Street
Suite 801
Toronto ON  M5C 2T2
Canada
Phone: (416) 867-7422
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Canada
Phone: (905) 845-2571
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: W. Bradley Kates Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 07 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Kates ( CPSO# 62538 )

Business Address:
304 - 1235 Trafalgar Road
Oakville ON  L6H 3P1
Phone Number: (905) 842-3555

Business Address:
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571

Business Address:
61 Queen Street East
8th Floor
Toronto ON  M5C 2T2
Phone Number: (416) 867-7422

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 24 Oct 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WARREN BRADLEY KATES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KATES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1990 to 17 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 1991