Kathiravelu, Satheesh (CPSO#: 92477)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Feb 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 03 Feb 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Sinhalese, Tamil

Education:Ross University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
Hospitalist Office
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone: (705) 743-2121 Ext. 3084
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Satheesh Kathiravelu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 03 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kathiravelu ( CPSO# 92477 )

Business Address:
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
Hospitalist Office
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 743-2121

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 03 Feb 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Feb 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Feb 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 02 Aug 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Aug 2011
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 05 Aug 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Jan 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 28 Jan 2016 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Satheesh  Kathiravelu  may  practise  medicine  independently  in internal
            medicine.