Katipunan, Kathleen Kwan (CPSO#: 100852)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Tagalog

Education:University of Santo Tomas, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
SKiN Laser Clinic
775 Monaghan Road South
Peterborough ON  K9J 5K2
Phone: 7057753223
Fax: 7057753376
Electoral District: 06

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KATHLEEN KWAN KATIPUNAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KATIPUNAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 22 Sep 2013
Assessment Verification Period - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 25 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 26 Aug 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017