Katsios, Christina Maria (CPSO#: 92814)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Greek, Spanish

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sault Area Hospital
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie, Ontario
Hamilton ON  P6P 0A8
Phone: (705) 759-3434
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Thunder Bay Regional Health
Sciences Center
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B6V4
Canada
Phone: (807) 684-60
County: District of Thunder Bay
Electoral District: 09

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 06 May 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTINA MARIA KATSIOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KATSIOS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2015