Kattan, Abdullah Essam A (CPSO#: 80595)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 10 Dec 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 10 Dec 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Saud University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saudi Arabia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 May 2004 to 16 Jun 2004
PEAP - Resident - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 May 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Mar 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Aug 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2011
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 10 Dec 2015