Kattan, Maan Abdulrahman Ahmed (CPSO#: 75677)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Sep 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Sep 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 25 Sep 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 2000 to 25 Sep 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 26 Sep 2001 to 25 Sep 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 26 Sep 2002 to 25 Sep 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 26 Sep 2003 to 25 Sep 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 26 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Sep 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 2005 to 30 Sep 2006
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 2006 to 31 Mar 2007
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Oct 2011 to 30 Sep 2012
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2012