Katz, Paul Richard (CPSO#: 94414)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 10 May 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 10 May 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Michigan, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - New York

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 25 Oct 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Sep 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 07 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 10 May 2015