Katz, Sherri Lynne (CPSO#: 71532)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dept. of Pediatrics - Respirology
The Children's Hospital of
Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 2868
Fax: (613) 738-4297
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sherri Katz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 22 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Katz ( CPSO# 71532 )

Business Address:
The Children's Hosiptal of Eastern Ontario
Suite 1403
401 Smyth Raod
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Business Address:
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 26 Sep 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHERRI LYNNE KATZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KATZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Respirology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Respirology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2001