Katzberg, Hans Dieter (CPSO#: 77740)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Feb 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Feb 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Neurology
200 Elizabeth Street
5EC 306A
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3662
Fax: (416) 340-4081
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hans D. Katzberg Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 25 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Katzberg ( CPSO# 77740 )

Business Address:
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Neurology
200 Elizabeth Street
5EC - 306-A
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-3662

Business Address:
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 340-3662

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HANS DIETER KATZBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KATZBERG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Feb 2010