Kauffeldt, Katherine Anne (CPSO#: 93269)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
City of Lakes Family Health Team
1679 Main Street
Val Caron ON  P3N 1R8
Phone: (705) 897-1018
Fax: (705) 897-2234
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. K. Kauffeldt Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 10 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Kauffeldt ( CPSO# 93269 )

Business Address:
City of Lakes Family Health Team
1679 Main Street
Val Caron ON  P3N 1R8
Phone Number: (705) 897-1018

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 27 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KATHERINE ANNE KAUFFELDT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAUFFELDT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2013