Kaur, Harkiran (CPSO#: 83328)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Mothilal Nehru Medical College,Allahabad, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
100 Queensway West
Department of Pathology
Trillium Health Partners (M-site)
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone: (905) 848-7100 Ext. 2341
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. H. Kaur Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 08 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Kaur ( CPSO# 83328 )

Business Address:
Trillium Health Partners (M-Site)
Department of Pathology
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HARKIRAN KAUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAUR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 22 Sep 2005
Assessment Verification Period - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 23 Sep 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Oct 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 2011