Kaura, Amit (CPSO#: 94141)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 12 Apr 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 12 Apr 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Medical University of the Americas, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Jul 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 04 Jan 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Aug 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Mar 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Apr 2012