Kay, Amin (CPSO#: 90608)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jan 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:Boston University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Regional Cancer Centre
2220 Kildare Road
Windsor ON  N8W 2X3
Phone: (519) 253-5253
Fax: (519) 253-4204
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Amin Kay Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 14 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kay ( CPSO# 90608 )

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Cancer Centre
2220 Kildare Road
Windsor ON  N8W 2X3
Phone Number: (519) 253-5253

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMIN KAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2014