Kay, Emily Susan (CPSO#: 95574)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Aug 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
725 Arlington Park Place
Kingston ON  K7M 7E4
Phone: (613) 546-1858
Fax: (613) 546-4060
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Emily Kay Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 27 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Kay ( CPSO# 95574 )

Business Address:
725 Arlington Park Place
Kingston ON  K7M 7E4
Phone Number: (613) 546-1858

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Immunology and Allergy Effective: 15 Oct 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EMILY SUSAN KAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2016