Kayedi, Mandana (CPSO#: 94535)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:AHWAZ UNIVERSITY OF MEDICAL SCIENCES, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Southlake Regional Health Centre
Department of Medicine
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Fax: (905) 853-2204
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Canada
Phone: 416 242 1000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mandana Kayedi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 19 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kayedi ( CPSO# 94535 )

Business Address:
Southlake Regional Health Centre
Department of Medicine
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P1
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Business Address:
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (647) 223-2630

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MANDANA KAYEDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAYEDI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2010 to 22 Dec 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Dec 2010 to 28 Jan 2011
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Jan 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Dec 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Dec 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014