Kazandji, Dalal (CPSO#: 90892)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 210
6633 Highway 7
Markham ON  L3P 7P2
Phone: (905) 294-3170
Fax: (905) 294-3379
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dalal Kazandji Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 17 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Kazandji ( CPSO# 90892 )

Business Address:
Unit 210
6633 Highway 7 East
Markham ON  L3P 7P2
Phone Number: (905) 294-3170

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DALAL KAZANDJI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAZANDJI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Mar 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2012 to 30 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2012