Kazem, Tarek (CPSO#: 95195)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jan 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jan 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3001 Hospital Gate, Oakville, ON
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone: (905)845-2571
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kazem Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 19 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Kazem ( CPSO# 95195 )

Business Address:
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Jan 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TAREK KAZEM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAZEM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 13 Jan 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 14 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 13 Jan 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Palliative Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jan 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2014