Kazemian, Pedram (CPSO#: 81194)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Aug 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Aug 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - New Jersey

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiology Effective: 31 Dec 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Dec 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PEDRAM KAZEMIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAZEMIAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Dec 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 21 Sep 2009 to 05 Oct 2009
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Oct 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 2013