Kearney, Sarah Alexandra (CPSO#: 89074)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Oct 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Oct 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Paediatrics
Division of Adolescent Medicine
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-6166
Fax: (416) 813-5392
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospita
Department of Paediatrics
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Canada
Phone: (905) 845-2571
Fax: (905) 815-5076
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 24 May 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SARAH ALEXANDRA KEARNEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KEARNEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Adolescent Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Adolescent Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Nov 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Sep 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Jan 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Oct 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 2017