Kedar, Reuven (CPSO#: 96791)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Aug 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Aug 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Technion-Israel Institute of Technology, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Sep 2011 to 04 Dec 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Clinical Pharmacology

University of Toronto, 05 Dec 2011 to 30 Sep 2012
Clinical Fellow - Clinical Pharmacology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Dec 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2012