Keen, Sabina Lore Chantal (CPSO#: 76076)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Sep 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Sep 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Josephs Centre for Ambulatory
Health Services
2757 King Street East
Hamilton ON  L8G 5E4
Phone: (905) 573-4818
Fax: (905) 573-4820
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 26 Dec 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SABINA LORE CHANTAL KEEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KEEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 28 Feb 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Geriatric Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Mar 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 26 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Dec 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2008