Keenan, Marissa (CPSO#: 101116)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2018

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Riverside
Campus
Division of Rheumatology
1967 Riverside Dr
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone: (613) 738-8400 Ext. 81850
Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARISSA KEENAN shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. KEENAN is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF OTTAWA;

(2) Dr. KEENAN shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. KEENAN is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. KEENAN shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. KEENAN is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. KEENAN no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2019.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 09 Apr 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Apr 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018