Keetbaas, Shayne Dirk (CPSO#: 84923)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michaels Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 360-4000
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Sunnybrook Hospital
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Canada
Phone: (416) 480-6100
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Holland Centre Hospital
43 Wellesley Street East
Toronto ON  M4Y 1H1
Canada
Phone: (416) 967-8500
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Womens College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Canada
Phone: (416) 323-6400
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Rouge Valley Centenary Hospital
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Canada
Phone: (416) 284-8131
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Canada
Phone: (905) 494-2120
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Etobicoke General Hospital
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Canada
Phone: (416) 494-2120
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

St. Joseph's Hospital
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Canada
Phone: (416) 530-6000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Michael Garron Hospital
825 Coxwell Ave
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Canada
Phone: (416) 461-8272
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Mackenzie Health Hospital
10 Trench St
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Canada
Phone: (905)883-1212
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Canada
Phone: (416) 242-1000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church St
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Canada
Phone: (905) 472 7000
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shayne Keetbaas Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 14 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Keetbaas ( CPSO# 84923 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 360-4000

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Hospital
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Business Address:
Holland Centre Hospital
43 Wellesley Street East
Toronto ON  M4Y 1H1
Phone Number: (416) 967-8500

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Hospital
30 The Weensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6000

Business Address:
Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone Number: (416) 323-6400

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHAYNE DIRK KEETBAAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KEETBAAS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011