Keeton, Linda Helen (CPSO#: 58023)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Aug 1988

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Record Storage and Retrieval Services Inc. (RSRS) 1-888-563-3732, ext. 1
Instructions: Medical records are being stored at the above location.
Date Received: 31 Jan 2018


Instructions: Patients wishing to obtain copies of Dr. Keeton's medical records should contact Dr. Keeton by telephone at: 905-528-5858, or by fax: 905-388-5069.
Date Received: 31 Oct 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nova Scotia

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LINDA HELEN KEETON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KEETON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 1988

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: July 25, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)