Kehoe, Shannon Brigid (CPSO#: 94947)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Sep 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 30 Apr 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shannon Kehoe Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 24 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kehoe ( CPSO# 94947 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Sep 2013 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 04 Apr 2011 to 02 May 2011
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Apr 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 May 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2013
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Apr 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 30 Apr 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 30 Apr 2018 Active View Details [+]
            As from April 30, 2018, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Shannon Brigid Kehoe
            in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Kehoe to the College
            of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr. Kehoe has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in all
                  jurisdictions.