Keila, Parambir Singh (CPSO#: 95800)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Quinte Health Care
Emergency Department
1-H Manor Lane
Bancroft ON  K0L 1C0
Phone: (613) 332-2825 Ext. 6229
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Trenton Memorial Hospital
Emergency Department
242 King Street
Trenton ON  K8V5S6
Canada
County: County of Hastings
Electoral District: 06

Belleville General Hospital
265 Dundas St E
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Canada
County: County of Hastings
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Parambir S. Keila Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 06 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Keila ( CPSO# 95800 )

Business Address:
North Hastings Hospital
Emergency Department
1H Manor Lane
Bancroft ON  K0L 1C0
Phone Number: (613) 332-2825

Business Address:
1P Manor Lane
Bancroft ON  K0L 1C0

Business Address:
242 King Street
Trenton ON  K8V 5S6

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Healthcare North Hastings,Bancroft Bancroft
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PARAMBIR SINGH KEILA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KEILA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Care of the Elderly

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2013