Keir, Michelle Lorraine (CPSO#: 92483)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: Catton, Michelle Lorraine (used until: 28 Oct 2012 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 05 Nov 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 08 Feb 2010 to 07 Mar 2010
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 19 Nov 2012 to 16 Dec 2012
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 08 Dec 2014 to 19 Dec 2014
Elective Trainee - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Dec 2016
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Feb 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Mar 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Dec 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Dec 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Dec 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Apr 2016
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017