Kekre, Natasha Kiran (CPSO#: 88686)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Aug 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Aug 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
Ctr for Practice Changing Research
Box 201A
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 71064
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kekre Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 14 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Kekre ( CPSO# 88686 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital
Centre for Practice Changing Research
Box 201A
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8899

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 18 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NATASHA KIRAN KEKRE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KEKRE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2013