Kelford, Alison Maureen (CPSO#: 66634)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Dec 1995

Summary

Former Name: Kelford Smith, Alison Maureen (used until: 05 Feb 1996 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Centre for Mindfulness Studies
180 Sudbury St, Unit c2
toronto, ontario
M6J0A8
Oakville ON  L6H 0M2
Phone: (905)330-8893
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Mindfulness Centre
345 Lakeshore Ave
Oakville
L6J 1J5
Oakville ON  L6J 1J5
Canada
Phone: 905-338-1386
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Dec 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALISON MAUREEN KELFORD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KELFORD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 31 Aug 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Sep 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Jan 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 1995