Kelkile, Teshome Shibre (CPSO#: 92475)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Sep 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Sep 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Addis Ababa University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2010 to 09 Mar 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 10 Mar 2010 to 31 Jan 2011
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Sep 2014
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Feb 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Mar 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2014