Kelly, Adrienne Margaret (CPSO#: 92250)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Aug 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 220
955 Queen Street East
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 2C3
Phone: (705) 450-6105
Fax: (705) 450-6104
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Adrienne M. Kelly Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 08 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kelly ( CPSO# 92250 )

Business Address:
Sault Area Hospital
Division of Orthopaedic Surgery
Unit 220
955 Queen Street East
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 2C3
Phone Number: (705) 450-6105

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ADRIENNE MARGARET KELLY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KELLY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 16 Nov 2009 to 05 Jan 2010
Elective Trainee - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Nov 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Jan 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 2015