Kelly, Emily Ruth (CPSO#: 89172)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Jan 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Jan 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
South Huron Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
24 Huron Street West
Exeter ON  N0M 1S2
Phone: (519) 235-2700
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

6 Albert St.
Parry Sound, ON
P2A 3A4
Parry Sound ON  P2A 3A4
Canada
Phone: (705) 746-9321 Ext. -
County: Territorial District of Parry Sound
Electoral District: 08

98 Shipley St.
Clinton, ON
N0M1L0
Clinton ON  N0M 1L0
Canada
Phone: (519) 482-3440
Fax: 519-482-8762
County: County of Huron
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Emily Kelly Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 29 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Kelly ( CPSO# 89172 )

Business Address:
98 Shipley Street
Clinton ON  N0M 1L0
Phone Number: (519) 482-3447

Business Address:
South Huron Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
24 Huron Street West
Exeter ON  N0M 1S2
Phone Number: (519) 235-2700

Business Address:
6 Albert Street
Parry Sound ON  P2A 3A4
Phone Number: (705) 746-4540

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Clinton Public Hospital Clinton
South Huron Hospital Exeter
West Parry Sound Health Centre Parry Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jan 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EMILY RUTH KELLY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KELLY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 23 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Dec 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jan 2011