Kelly, Kathleen Evelyn (CPSO#: 72268)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4270 Innes Road
Orleans ON  K4A 5E6
Phone: (613) 841-7009
Fax: (613) 841-0106
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. K.E. Kelly Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 19 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Kelly ( CPSO# 72268 )

Business Address:
4270 Innes Road
Orleans ON  K4A 5E6
Phone Number: (613) 841-7009

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KATHLEEN EVELYN KELLY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KELLY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 2000