Kelton, David Stewart (CPSO#: 83152)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brampton Civic Hospital, WOHS
2100 Bovaird Drive East (S.2.749)
Interventional Radiology
Brampton
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120 Ext. Ext. 58556
Fax: (905) 494-6614
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Osler Vascular & Vein
10 Cottrelle Blvd, unit 105
Brampton ON  L6S 0E2
Canada
Phone: 905 497 2255
Fax: 905 497 2261
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David S. Kelton Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 07 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Kelton ( CPSO# 83152 )

Business Address:
Osler Vascular & Vein
10 Cottrelle Boulevard
Suite 105
Brampton ON  L6S 0E2
Phone Number: (905) 497-2255

Business Address:
Diagnostic Radiology
Brampton Civic Hospital
William Osler Health System
2100 Bovaird Drive East, S.2.749
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Business Address:
40 Finchgate Boulevard
Brampton ON  L6T 3J1
Phone Number: (905) 792-8440

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID STEWART KELTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KELTON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010