Kemp, Sheelagh Margaret (CPSO#: 55955)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jan 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:American University of the Caribbean, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hospital For Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Suite 2212 D
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7453
Fax: (416) 813-7543
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Holland Bloorview Rehab Hosp
150 Kilgour Rd
Toronto ON  M4G 1R8
Canada
Phone: (416) 425-6220 Ext. 3465
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Darling Home for Kids
5657 15th Sideroad
Milton ON  L9T 2X7
Canada
Phone: (905) 878-7673
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sheelagh M. Kemp Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 23 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kemp ( CPSO# 55955 )

Business Address:
Hospital for Sick Children
Suite 2304
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-7453

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Holland Bloorview Kids Rehabilitation Hospital Toronto
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 22 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHEELAGH MARGARET KEMP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KEMP is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 31 Dec 1990
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 1990