Keng, Christine Jia-Shin (CPSO#: 95532)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Mandarin

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mackenzie Health
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone: (905) 883-1212
Fax: (647) 846-8677
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. C. Keng & D. Chu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 20 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Keng ( CPSO# 95532 )
Dr. D. Chu ( CPSO# 103349)

Business Address:
10 Trench Avenue
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212

Business Address:
Postgraduate Medical Education
McMaster University
Room MDCL - 3101A
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Colorectal Surgery Effective: 26 Sep 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTINE JIA-SHIN KENG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KENG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Colorectal Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 7 - Colorectal Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016