Kennedy, Christine Anne Sheila (CPSO#: 80863)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Aug 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Calgary, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
214 - 150 Eagle Ridge Blvd
Fort McMurray AB  T9K 2Y9

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Walkerton Site Walkerton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 21 Jun 2006 CFPC Specialist
Public Health and Preventive Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTINE ANNE SHEILA KENNEDY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KENNEDY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Community Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 07 Mar 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Community Medicine

Queen's University, 08 Mar 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Community Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Community Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 26 Apr 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Apr 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2014