Kennedy, Christopher Blair (CPSO#: 78046)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Dalhousie University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa General Hospital
501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 798-5555
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Ottawa Civic Hospital
1053 Carlin Ave
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Canada
Phone: (613) 798-5555
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

The Montford Hospital
713 Montreal Rd
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Canada
Phone: (613) 746-4621
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christopher Kennedy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 10 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Kennedy ( CPSO# 78046 )

Business Address:
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Business Address:
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Business Address:
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4621

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 01 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER BLAIR KENNEDY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KENNEDY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Feb 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Feb 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 18 Feb 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 2015