Kennedy, Shauna Maureen (CPSO#: 88998)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Nov 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton General Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 46521
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1 Young St
Hamilton ON  L8N 1T8
Canada
Phone: 905-529-3732
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Kennedy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 30 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kennedy ( CPSO# 88998 )

Business Address:
Hamilton General Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
Barton Radiologists
1 - 218 Young Street
Hamilton ON  L8N 1T8
Phone Number: (905) 572-6868

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHAUNA MAUREEN KENNEDY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KENNEDY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Nov 2013