Kenny, Paul Edward (CPSO#: 30282)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P.E. Kenny Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 28 2018

Medical Records Location

Address: Unit B, 310 Bridge St W Napanee ON K7R 0A4
Date Received: 28 May 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1979 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018