Kent, Lara Colette (CPSO#: 77500)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: Houlahan, Lara Colette (used until: 06 Apr 2004 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
420 Cooper Street
Ottawa ON  K2P 2N6
Phone: (613) 233-4697
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LARA COLETTE KENT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KENT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004