Kent, Rebecca Midori (CPSO#: 88818)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Dec 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Dec 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 202
348 Muskoka Road 3 North
Huntsville ON  P1H 1H8
Phone: (705) 788-3623
Fax: (705) 788-3624
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Huntsville District Mem. Hospital
100 Frank Miller Drive
Huntsville ON  P1H 1H7
Canada
Phone: (705) 789-0022
County: District Municipality of Muskoka
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Daniel Purcell & Rebecca Kent Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 30 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Kent ( CPSO# 88818 )
Dr. D. Purcell ( CPSO# 89422 )

Business Address:
348 Muskoka Road 3 north
Suite 102 & 202
Huntsville ON  P1H 1H8
Phone Number: (705) 789-4377

Business Address:
100 Frank Miller Drive
Huntsville ON  P1H 1H7
Phone Number: (705) 789-2311

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Muskoka Algonquin Health Care,South Muskoka Memorial Site Bracebridge
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare,Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Dec 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. REBECCA MIDORI KENT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KENT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 25 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Sep 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2011