Kenworthy, Christopher Paul (CPSO#: 27779)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Liverpool, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kenworthy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 10 2018

Medical Records Location

Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc. 111 St Regis Crescent S North York, ON M3J 1Y6 Tel: 416-398-0638 Fax: 416-398-5932 Toll Free: 1-866-356-3621 ext. 1
Instructions: Patients should contact Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc. to request a copy of their medical record.
Date Received: 03 Apr 2018

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1975 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018